CA SB215 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1001.36 of the Penal Code, relating to diversion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Diversion: mental disorders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB215 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 215 Beall Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 215 Beall Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER Amendment Set #1 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB215 Beall et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-29SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 2.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyJune 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-14AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-04-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4125.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-25SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-01-25SenateRead third time and amended.
2018-01-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4055.) (January 18).
2018-01-17SenateSet for hearing January 18.
2018-01-16SenateJanuary 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-01-10SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2018-01-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4006.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-12-21SenateSet for hearing January 9.
2017-04-04SenateApril 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-16SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-03-13SenateMarch 21 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-01SenateSet for hearing March 21.
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1001.36Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1001.82New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code2605New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback