CA SB207 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2006.6 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to county roads, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
County road commissioner: County of Siskiyou.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB207 Dahle Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Assembly - SB 207 Dahle Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB207 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Assembly - SB 207 Dahle Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB207 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-08 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3963.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3459.) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3362.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4116.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23). |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | June 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1349.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1183.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 500.) (March 15). |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 15. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 2006.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |