CA SB20 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 43890) to Chapter 4 of Part 5 of Division 26 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.
Title
Low Carbon Fuels Council.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB20 Pavley (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB20 Pavley (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | Died on the inactive file. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 11). |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2016-08-10 | Assembly | August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 30). |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-08-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 1213.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1145.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 648.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 405.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. |
2014-12-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 43890 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 13752 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 86000 | New Code | See Bill Text |