CA SB193 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 830, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 830, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6276.12 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 147.2 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Hazard evaluation system and information service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB193 Monning Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 193 Monning Senate Third Reading By MURATSUCHI (Y: 56 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB193 Monning (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 193 Monning Senate Third Reading By MURATSUCHI (Y: 56 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB193 Monning (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 830, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 4871.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 23. Page 6407.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6282.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 13). |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-08-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 2). |
2013-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and E.S. & T.M. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 1114.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 662.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6276.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 147.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |