CA SB190 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 678, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 678, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 27757 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 1203.016, 1203.1ab, and 1208.2 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 207.2, 332, 634, 652.5, 654, 654.6, 656, 659, 700, 729.9, 729.10, 871, 900, 902, 903, 903.1, 903.2, 903.25, 903.4, 903.45, 903.5, and 904 of, and to repeal Section 903.15 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB190 Mitchell et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Assembly - SB 190 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 57 N: 9 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB190 Mitchell et al (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Assembly - SB 190 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 57 N: 9 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB190 Mitchell et al (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 678, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 3. Page 2524.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 9. Page 2970.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (August 23). |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HUM. S. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 4. Page 1250.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Published May 26 at 10 a.m. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1179.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | April 24 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 624.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | April 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 429.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |