CA SB188 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 58, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 58, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 212.1 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 12926 of the Government Code, relating to discrimination.
Title
Discrimination: hairstyles.
Sponsors
Sen. Holly Mitchell [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Shirley Weber [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Assembly - SB 188 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By Kamlager-Dove (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB188 Mitchell et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB188 Mitchell et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 58, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2448.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 743.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 438.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 212.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |