CA SB182 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 5414.) Ordered to the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 65007, 65302, 65584, 65584.04, and 65584.06 of, and to add Sections 65011, 65012, 65013, 65040.18, 65302.11, 65860.2, 65865.6, 65962.3, and 66474.03 to, the Government Code, to amend Section 13132.7 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 4123.6 to the Public Resources Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government: planning and zoning: wildfires.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 182 Jackson Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB182 Jackson et al. Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be taken up for consideration (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 182 Jackson Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 66 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-06 - Assembly - SB 182 Jackson Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY Amendment Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB182 Jackson (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-31 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 5414.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-09-30 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2020-09-30 Vetoed by the Governor.
2020-09-08SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2020-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 5.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 1.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-25AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-25AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2020-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-24AssemblyAction rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-09-13SenateOrdered to the Assembly.
2019-09-13SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be taken up for consideration. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 2963.)
2019-09-12SenateSeptember 12 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-09-11SenateSet for hearing September 12.
2019-09-11SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HOUSING pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2808.) Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2019-09-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2019-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 10. Page 3332.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-06AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 13. Page 3078.)
2019-09-06AssemblyAssembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 3077.)
2019-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 30).
2019-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-11Assembly(Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
2019-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-06-27AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2019-06-13AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2019-06-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
2019-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 1362.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-24SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-05-24SenateRead third time and amended.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1091.) (May 16).
2019-05-16SenateMay 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 774.) (April 22).
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-04-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 713.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-03-28SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-03-18SenateMarch 27 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-13SenateSet for hearing March 27.
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-01-30SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65007Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65011New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65012New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65013New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65040.18New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65302Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65302.11New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65584Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65584.04Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65584.06Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65860.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65865.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65962.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code66474.03New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code13132.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4123.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback