CA SB180 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 677, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 677, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11370.2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Controlled substances: sentence enhancements: prior convictions.
Sponsors
Sen. Holly Mitchell [D] | Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Sen. Steven Bradford [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SB 180 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By KALRA (Y: 41 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB180 Mitchell et al (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB180 Mitchell et al (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 677, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 33. Page 3224.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 27). |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | June 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 1064.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 747.) (April 18). |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11370.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |