CA SB18 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Set for hearing April 29.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 38561.7 to the Health and Safety Code, to add and repeal Section 25327.5 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 400.2 and 400.3 of, and to add Sections 380.1 and 380.6 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Green hydrogen.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2021-03-23SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2021-03-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 15).
2021-03-02SenateSet for hearing March 15.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and EQ.
2020-12-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
2020-12-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code38561.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code25327.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code380.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code380.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code400.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code400.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback