CA SB179 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22013 and 50003.5 of the Financial Code, relating to mortgage loan originators.
Title
Mortgage loan originators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 799.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 50003.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |