CA SB167 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 333, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 333, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 42885.5 and 42889 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: waste tires.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-09 - Assembly - SB 167 Ducheny Senate Third Reading By SALAS (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB167 Ducheny (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB167 Ducheny (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 333, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-28 | Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-09-10 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-09-09 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 3228.) To Senate. | |
2009-08-31 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.) | |
2009-05-28 | To Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2009-05-14 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 888.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-05 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-04-24 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2009-04-22 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-21 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 585.) | |
2009-03-24 | Set for hearing April 20. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on EQ. | |
2009-02-15 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |
2009-02-14 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |