CA SB160 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14199.85 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Medi-Cal managed care organization provider tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB160 B. & F.R. (Skinner) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2024-06-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 14. Page 5978.) |
2024-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 505.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 357.) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14199.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |