CA SB1580 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 798, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 798, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to state surplus property, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
State surplus property: armories: sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1580 Committee on G.O. (Wright) Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1580 G.O. Senate Third Reading By HAYASHI (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1580 Committee on G.O. (Wright) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1580 G.O. Senate Third Reading By HAYASHI (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1580 Committee on G.O. (Wright) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 798, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 p.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4856.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-24 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6174.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-21 | Read third time and amended. (Page 6051.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). | |
2012-08-06 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-18 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-06-15 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-05-14 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3495.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-09 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-08 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-04-27 | Set for hearing May 7. | |
2012-04-24 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3264.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-30 | Set for hearing April 24. | |
2012-03-26 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-03-21 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 20. | |
2012-03-20 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 435.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |