CA SB155 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 258, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 49015 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Sections 11553.5, 63048.92, 63048.93, 63048.94, and 63048.95 of, and to add and repeal Section 12805.9 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 39719, 43018.9, 44270.3, 44271, 44272, 44272.5, 44273, 116766, 116767, and 116773.4 of, to amend the heading of Article 2 (commencing with Section 44272) of Chapter 8.9 of Part 5 of Division 26 of, and to add Section 44271.5 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 5090.15, 42012, 42013, 42014, 42019, 42020, 42023.1, 42023.4, 42024, and 42999 of, to add Sections 5090.42, 21166.2, 31103.1, and 42025 to, to add and repeal Sections 14571.6.1 and 21080.56 of, and to repeal Sections 42011, 42015, 42016, 42017, 42018, and 42021 of, the Public Resources Code, to amend Section 2827.10 of the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Sections 5001, 5101, 5104, and 5202 of the Water Code, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public resources trailer bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - SB 155 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB155 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB155 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-23 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 258, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-23 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2021-09-09SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 2572.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 7.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-09-07AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-07AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2021-09-07AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 2809.)
2021-09-07AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-02-25Assembly(Corrected May 14).
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-02-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-02-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 286.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-02-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-02-16SenateOrdered to second reading.
2021-02-16SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.)
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-01-11SenateRead first time.
2021-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2021-01-08SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code49015Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11553.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12805.9Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code63048.92Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code63048.93Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code63048.94Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code63048.95Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code116766Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code116767Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code116773.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code39719Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code43018.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code44270.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code44271Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code44271.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code44272Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code44272.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code44273Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14571.6.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code21080.56Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code21166.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code31103.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code42012Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code42013Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code42014Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code42019Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code42020Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code42023.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code42023.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code42024Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code42025New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code42999Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5090.15Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5090.42New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code2827.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code5001Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code5101Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code5104Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code5202Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback