CA SB152 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-30 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-30 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5778.5 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Medi-Cal funding: mental health services.
Sponsors
Sen. Elaine Alquist [D] | Asm. Bill Berryhill [R] | Sen. Dave Cogdill [R] | Sen. Dave Cox [R] |
Asm. Chuck de Vore [R] | Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Asm. Kevin Jeffries [R] | Sen. Roger Niello [R] |
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] | Asm. Jim Silva [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB152 Cox (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-05-14 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-05-06 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-06 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 793.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-28 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 655.) | |
2009-04-17 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2009-04-14 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 420.) | |
2009-03-12 | Set for hearing April 1. | |
2009-02-23 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-02-13 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | |
2009-02-12 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |