CA SB1519 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19859, 19878, 19879, 19882, and 19892 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to gambling.
Title
Gambling Control Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1519 G.O. (Dodd) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 3530.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 6. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19859 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19878 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19879 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19882 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19892 | Amended Code | Citation Text |