CA SB1500 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 955, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 955, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1602.5, 1609, 1635.1, and 111656.1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Public health: federal regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1500 HEALTH Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1500 HEALTH (Pan) Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1500 HEALTH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB1500 HEALTH (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1500 HEALTH (Pan) Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1500 HEALTH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB1500 HEALTH (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 955, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5416.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-24 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. | |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5830.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | June 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3938.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3798.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3543.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27 in HEALTH pending receipt. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 111656.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1602.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1609 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1635.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |