CA SB149 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An act to amend Section 719 of the Civil Code, relating to real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City property: leases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03SenateReturned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2013-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2013-02-01SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
2013-01-31SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code719Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback