CA SB149 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to the payment of claims against the state, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Claims against the state: appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB149 Kehoe Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-01 - Assembly - SB 149 Kehoe Third Reading Urgency By DE LEON (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB149 Kehoe Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2009.
2009-10-11 Approved by Governor.
2009-09-11 Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
2009-09-04 Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2221.) To enrollment.
2009-09-02 In Senate. To unfinished business.
2009-09-01 Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2858.) To Senate.
2009-08-24 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-08-20 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
2009-08-18 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-07-01 Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-06-08 To Com. on APPR.
2009-06-01 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2009-06-01 Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1096.) To Assembly.
2009-05-28 Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
2009-05-27 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1025.)
2009-05-20 Set for hearing May 26.
2009-02-23 To Com. on APPR.
2009-02-13 From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2009-02-12 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_149&sess=0910&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_bill_20090212_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_bill_20090528_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_bill_20090818_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_bill_20090908_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_bill_20091011_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_vote_20090526_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_vote_20090601_0105PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_vote_20090819_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_vote_20090901_1054AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_149_vote_20090904_1201PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback