CA SB1483 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 91013 of, and to add Section 83116.7 to, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
The Political Reform Act of 1974: Fair Political Practices Commission: political reform education program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3237.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 83116.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 91013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |