CA SB1479 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 850, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 850, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 9 (commencing with Section 32096) of Chapter 1 of Part 19 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to public health.
Title
COVID-19 testing in schools: COVID-19 testing plans.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Asm. Akilah Weber [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1479 Pan et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1479 Pan Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1479 Pan et al (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1479 Pan Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 55 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1479 Pan et al (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 850, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 4937.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 16. Page 5950.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-08-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 1 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14)). |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 29). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 3877.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3798.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3540.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3274.) (March 30). |
2022-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 32096 | New Code | See Bill Text |