CA SB1473 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 290.09 of the Penal Code, relating to sex crimes.
Title
Sex offenders.
Sponsors
Sen. John Laird [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3534.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 290.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |