CA SB1473 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2924.8 of the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 415.46 and 1161b of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to tenants.
Title
Tenants: foreclosure and unlawful detainer.
Sponsors
Sen. Ellen Corbett [D] | Sen. Mark DeSaulnier [D] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1473 Hancock (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1473 Hancock (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-30 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8). | |
2012-07-05 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-07-03 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 3). | |
2012-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-06-19 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |
2012-06-15 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. | |
2012-05-31 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 3740.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-05-04 | Set for hearing May 14. | |
2012-04-26 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3207.) (April 17). | |
2012-04-11 | Set for hearing April 17. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-03-29 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-25 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 415.46 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2924.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |