CA SB1472 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 311, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 311, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the heading of Chapter 1 (commencing with Section 7301) of Part 3 of Division 6 of, to add Section 6010 to, to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 7400) to Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 6 of, to repeal Section 7304 of, to repeal Article 2 (commencing with Section 7401) of Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 6 of, and to repeal and add Section 7301 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Public resources: school lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1472 N.R. & W. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1472 N.R. & W. (Stern) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1472 N.R. & W. (Stern) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1472 N.R. & W. (Stern) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1472 N.R. & W. (Stern) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 311, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5283.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18). |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-06-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3795.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3561.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 5. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 6010 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 7301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 7304 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |