CA SB1471 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 69437 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cal Grant Program: Competitive Cal Grant A and B awards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateMay 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-16SenateApril 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-04-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4534.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code69437Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback