CA SB146 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1257.7 to the Water Code, relating to water resources.
Title
Water resources: permit to appropriate: protected species.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | April 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | March 28 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | March 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-02-18 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E., U. & C. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 17. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 3217 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 714 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 1257.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 1305 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB146 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB146 |