CA SB146 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4603.2 of the Labor Code, relating to workers' compensation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Workers' compensation: medical treatment: billing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-03 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB146 Lara Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Assembly - SB 146 Lara Third Reading Urgency By GONZALEZ (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Assembly - SB 146 Lara Motion to Reconsider By GONZALEZ (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - SB 146 Lara Third Reading Urgency By GONZALEZ (Y: 36 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2013-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB146 Lara (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Assembly - SB 146 Lara Third Reading Urgency By GONZALEZ (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Assembly - SB 146 Lara Motion to Reconsider By GONZALEZ (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - SB 146 Lara Third Reading Urgency By GONZALEZ (Y: 36 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2013-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB146 Lara (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-08-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1651.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-07-01 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 65. Noes 5. Page 2242.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2243.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 36. Noes 30. Page 2190.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Gonzalez. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2013-03-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 308.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 291.) (March 13). |
2013-03-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Set for hearing March 13. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 4603.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |