CA SB1459 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 857, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 857, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 26050.2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Cannabis: provisional license.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] |
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1459 Cannella Third Reading Urgency By WOOD (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1459 Cannella et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1459 Cannella et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1459 Cannella et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1459 Cannella et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 857, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 6174.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 6198.) |
2018-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6145.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 1.) (August 29). |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on AGRI. and B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 8). |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4941.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4696.) (April 17). |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26050.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 2279 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 57400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |