CA SB1453 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1628.7, 1632, 1632.5, 1632.55, 1634.1, 1635.5, 1638.1, 1646, 1646.1, 1646.2, 1646.3, 1646.9, 1647.2, 1647.3, 1647.6, 1647.18, 1647.19, 1647.20, 1647.22, 1647.30, 1647.31, 1647.32, 1700, 1718.3, 1724, 1740, 1750, 1750.1, 1750.2, 1750.3, 1750.4, 1750.5, 1752.1, 1752.4, 1753, 1753.5, 1753.6, 1804, and 1907 of, to add Sections 1646.12, 1647.37, 1647.38, 1754.5, and 1755 of, to repeal Sections 1607, 1632.1, 1749.1, 1752.6, 1753.7, and 2079 of, and to repeal and add Sections 1647.35, 1647.36, 1701.5, and 1741 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Dentistry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |