CA SB1445 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 327, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 327, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 35012 and 47604.2 of the Education Code, relating to school governance.
Title
Governing boards: pupil members: expulsion hearing recommendations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1445 Cortese Senate Third Reading By Bonta (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1445 Cortese (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1445 Cortese (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 327, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-08-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2024-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 6371.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 12). |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 5. Page 4012.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3660.) (April 17). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 35012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 47604.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |