CA SB1432 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 380 of, and to add Section 380.3 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: resource adequacy requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1432 Hueso Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1432 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1432 Hueso (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1432 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1432 Hueso (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5317.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | June 22 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-06 | Assembly | June 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3829.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3510.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 380 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 380.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |