CA SB1429 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12025 and 12025.1 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.
Title
Production or cultivation of cannabis, cannabis products, or industrial hemp: environmental violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 12025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 12025.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1429 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1429 |