CA SB1428 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10248 of, and to add Section 9027.5 to, the Government Code, relating to the Legislature.
Title
Legislative meetings: recording and transcription.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 10248 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 9027.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1428&sess=1112&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1401-1450/sb_1428_bill_20120224_introduced.html |