CA SB1424 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1748.80 and 1748.81 of the Civil Code, relating to business.
Title
Hotel and private residence rental reservations: cancellation: refunds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-16-2024]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-16-2024]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 23). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | April 16 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) Reconsideration granted. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | April 9 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1748.80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1748.81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |