CA SB1422 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 228, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 228, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 58 and 470.5 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to military courts.
Title
Military courts: sexual assault: courts-martial.
Sponsors
Sen. Alex Padilla [D] | Sen. Lou Correa [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1422 Padilla Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Assembly - SB 1422 Padilla Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1422 Padilla (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Assembly - SB 1422 Padilla Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1422 Padilla (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 228, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4403.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5917.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. (Corrected June 13.) |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3493.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | From special consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3219.) (April 22). |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 470.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 470.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 58 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 72 | Amended Code | Citation Text |