CA SB1417 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 99171 and 99172 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transit districts.
Title
Transit districts: prohibition orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1417 Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 3536.) (April 9). |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 99171 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |