CA SB1415 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 17920, 17920.3, 17975, 17980, 17980.6, 17980.7, 17980.11, and 17992 of, and to add Section 13149 to, and to add and repeal Section 13148 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1415 McGuire Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1415 McGuire Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1415 McGuire (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2018-09-30 Vetoed by the Governor.
2018-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-29SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5960.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 6700.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4317.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4310.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-25SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-23SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4724.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-04-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback