CA SB1415 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21083.10 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: local water projects: scoping meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | May 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3644.) (April 20). |
2016-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | April 6 set for first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21080.06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21083.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |