CA SB1415 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6981 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to olives.
Title
Olive trees: annual assessment: exemptions.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1415 Wolk (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-05-10 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. | |
2012-05-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3404.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-04-30 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-04-26 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-04-17 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3188.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-27 | Set for hearing April 17. | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Com. on AGRI. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 6981 | Amended Code | Citation Text |