CA SB1409 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 563, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 563, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 915 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission.
Title
Public Utilities Commission: safety investigations.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1409 Hill Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1409 Hill Senate Third Reading By PATTERSON (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Special Consent #14 SB1409 Hill (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1409 Hill Senate Third Reading By PATTERSON (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Special Consent #14 SB1409 Hill (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 563, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4913.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6451.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6282.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3468.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3296.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 311.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 321.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 451 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 731 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 915 | New Code | See Bill Text |