CA SB1409 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 617, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 617, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 65040.7 to the Government Code, relating to statewide planning.
Title
Office of Planning and Research: energy security.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Correa [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1409 Pavley Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1409 Pavley Senate Third Reading By COOK (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1409 Pavley (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1409 Pavley Senate Third Reading By COOK (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1409 Pavley (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 617, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-28 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2012-08-22 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4699.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-21 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-20 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 6026.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). | |
2012-06-28 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-18 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2012-05-30 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3694.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-25 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-24 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3596.) (May 24). | |
2012-05-22 | Set for hearing May 24. | |
2012-05-21 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-05-11 | Set for hearing May 21. | |
2012-05-03 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-01 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-04-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3304.) (April 24). | |
2012-04-11 | Set for hearing April 24. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and RLS. | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65040.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25010 | New Code | See Bill Text |