CA SB1406 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1569.269 and 1569.655 of, and to add Section 1569.801 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to residential care facilities.
Title
Residential care facilities for the elderly: resident services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3607.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1569.269 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.655 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1569.801 | New Code | See Bill Text |