CA SB1404 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 764, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 764, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 38134 of the Education Code, relating to school property.
Title
School property: Civic Center Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1404 Hancock Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1404 Hancock Senate Third Reading By BUCHANAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1404 Hancock (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1404 Hancock Senate Third Reading By BUCHANAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1404 Hancock (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 764, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 p.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4854.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-24 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6185.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-07-03 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-07-02 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 27). | |
2012-06-19 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-05-30 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 3664.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-25 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-24 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3596.) (May 24). | |
2012-05-18 | Set for hearing May 24. | |
2012-05-14 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-05-04 | Set for hearing May 14. | |
2012-05-01 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |
2012-04-26 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3231.) (April 18). | |
2012-03-29 | Set for hearing April 18. | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 10912 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 38134 | Amended Code | Citation Text |