CA SB139 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 23001, 23003, and 23004 of, and to add Sections 23001.5, 23005 and 23006 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Independent redistricting commissions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB139 Allen et al. Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 139 Allen Senate Third Reading By Salas (Y: 61 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB139 Allen et al (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13 Veto sustained.
2020-01-13 Stricken from file.
2019-10-13 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2019-10-13 Vetoed by the Governor.
2019-09-18SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 2028.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 17. Page 3197.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 30).
2019-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-06-03AssemblyReferred to Coms. on E. & R. and L. GOV.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 1221.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1090.) (May 16).
2019-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-13SenateMay 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 845.) (April 24).
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 523.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2019-03-07SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and GOV. & F.
2019-01-18SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 17.
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code23001Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code23001.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code23003Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code23004Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code23005New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code23006New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback