CA SB1381 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-29 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 16. Page 3702.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 110663 to, and to add Article 6.6 (commencing with Section 110808) to Chapter 5 of Part 5 of Division 104 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to genetically engineered food.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food labeling: genetically engineered food.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1381 Evans (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1381 Evans Reconsider (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1381 Evans (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Agriculture (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-29SenateRead third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 16. Page 3702.)
2014-05-28SenateRead third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 17. Page 3667.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Evans. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3668.)
2014-05-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3715.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 23.
2014-05-12SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2014-05-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-05-02SenateSet for hearing May 12.
2014-04-28SenateWithdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-04-24SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. Set for hearing April 29.
2014-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3235.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2014-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2014-04-03SenateRe-referred to Coms. on JUD. and AGRI. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2014-03-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2992.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2014-03-18SenateSet for hearing March 26.
2014-03-17SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH, AGRI., and JUD.
2014-02-24SenateRead first time.
2014-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2014-02-21SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code110663New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code111910Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1381&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1381_bill_20140221_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1381_bill_20140403_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1381_bill_20140424_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1381_bill_20140505_amended_sen_v96.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1381_vote_20140326_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1381_vote_20140422_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1381_vote_20140512_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1381_vote_20140523_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1381_vote_20140528_0650PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1381_vote_20140528_0651PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1381_vote_20140529_0347PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback