CA SB1375 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1357, 1357.500, 1357.503, 1357.600, and 1399.802 of, and to add Section 1399.846 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 10700, 10753, 10753.05, and 10755 of, and to add Section 10965.02 to, the Insurance Code, relating to health insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance: small employer groups.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1375 Hernandez et al (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 4339.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 4853.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-12SenateApril 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1357Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1357.500Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1357.503Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1357.512Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1357.600Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1367.006Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1399.802Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1399.846New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code10112.28Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10700Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10753Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10753.05Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10753.14Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10755Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10965.02New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback