CA SB1374 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 25301, 25302, 25303, 25304, and 25401.2 of, to amend and repeal Section 25303.5 of, and to repeal Sections 25305.5 and 25307 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission: Alternative and Renewable Fuel and Vehicle Technology Program: assessments and forecasts: integrated energy policy report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1374 Hueso Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1374 Hueso Senate Third Reading By QUIRK (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1374 Hueso (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-16AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Quirk.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4338.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-15SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-30SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4851.) (April 25).
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback