CA SB1369 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - March 31 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - March 31 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 11.5 (commencing with Section 65658) to Chapter 3 of Division 1 of Title 7 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 53559 of, and to add Section 18941.11 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to adaptive reuse.
Title
Adaptive reuse projects: by-right: funding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | March 31 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing March 31. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referral to Com. on E.Q. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., HOUSING, and E.Q. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65658 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18941.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53559 | Amended Code | Citation Text |