CA SB1367 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 738, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 32642, 32643, and 32656.1 of, and to add Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 32659) to Division 22.9 of the Public Resources Code, relating to the San Diego River Conservancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

San Diego River Conservancy: San Diego Rivers Watershed Consortium Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1367 Atkins et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1367 Atkins Senate Third Reading By GLORIA (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1367 Atkins et al (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-23 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 738, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-23 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblyAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 5959.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28AssemblyIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6717.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-23SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23SenateRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16SenateCoauthors revised.
2018-08-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08SenateAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2018-06-11SenateReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4309.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-05-01SenateMay 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4788.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code32642Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code32643Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code32656.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code32659New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback