CA SB1366 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1102.156 to the Civil Code, relating to real estate.
Title
Real property disclosure requirements: domestic water storage tank assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - Senate - Special Consent SB1366 Hurtado (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3448.) (April 2). |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1102.156 | New Code | See Bill Text |